THE DOROTHY SPRINGER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of disabled people in Sierra Leone in particular, but not exclusively, through vocational and educational training; To develop the capacity and skills of the disabled members of the socially and economically disadvantaged community of Sierra Leone in such a way that they are better able to identify and help meet their needs and to participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 13 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT LEA | Chair |
|
||||||
Paul Kerslake | Trustee | 21 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ABS DUMBUYA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK O'KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY HEATHER CALVERT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.66k | £20.86k | £17.75k | £22.81k | £21.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.70k | £13.72k | £13.72k | £23.02k | £23.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN SIERRA LEONE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH VOCATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL TRAINING. 2. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE DISABLED MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF SIERRA LEONE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
SIERRA LEONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 WOODMANCOTT CLOSE
BRACKNELL
RG12 0XU
- Phone:
- 01344304300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window