LOST CATS BRIGHTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lost Cats Brighton aims to relieve the suffering & distress of cats experience by rescuing abandoned, unwanted, mistreated, injured & homeless cats & kittens, providing veterinary care, food, accommodation as necessary, but with the ultimate aim of rehoming healthy animals whenever possible. In addition to trap, neuter & return feral cats, & to educate the public in feline welfare. (Sussex)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Hill | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leela Andrews | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hathaway | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Frances Higgins | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Martin Edwards | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.35k | £20.16k | £26.84k | £154.09k | £58.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.37k | £55.05k | £45.66k | £38.73k | £80.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 12 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF CATS AND KITTENS, BY RESCUING ABANDONED, UNWANTED, MISTREATED, INJURED AND HOMELESS CATS AND KITTENS, PROVIDING VETERINARY CARE, FOOD, ACCOMMODATION AS NECESSARY, BUT WITH THE ULTIMATE AIM OF RE-HOMING HEALTHY ANIMALS WHENEVER POSSIBLE. IN ADDITION TO TRAP, NEUTER AND RETURN FERAL CATS, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN FELINE WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRIGHTON AND EAST AND WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
223 South Coast Road
Peacehaven
East Sussex
BN10 8LB
- Phone:
- 01273 076944
- Email:
- info@lostcatsbrighton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window