Accounts and annual returns PILLAR COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1119079
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 April 2023 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 04 April 2023 58 days late
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time