Accounts and annual returns INSPIRATION MINISTRIES UK

Charity number: 1119076
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 July 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 January 2024 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 January 2024 65 days late
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 April 2020 On Time