UKRAINE CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ONE OF OUR PRIMARY OBJECTIVES IS TO RAISE FUNDS TO SUPPORT DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN IN UKRAINE. WE ORGANISE FUNDRAISING EVENTS OURSELVES AND INSPIRE OTHERS TO FUNDRAISE TOO. WE USE FUNDS RAISED TO PAY FOR PROJECTS RANGING FROM ESSENTIAL REPAIR WORKS IN ORPHANAGES TO SENDING GROUPS OF ORPHANS TO EDUCATIONAL SUMMER CAMPS OR PURCHASING MEDICAL AND OTHER EQUIPMENT. OVER 40 PROJECTS COMPLETED TO DATE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ukraine
Governance
- 14 September 2007: Standard registration
- 08 July 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 08 July 2016: Funds transferred to 1163036 UKRAINE CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.82k | £15.49k | £39.16k | £71.10k | £60.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.15k | £19.96k | £29.87k | £66.59k | £51.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 09 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 18 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 19 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 19 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (I) IN UKRAINIAN HISTORY, LANGUAGE AND CULTURE IN THE UK AND IN UKRAINE; (II) IN THE LEGAL RIGHTS AND ENTITLEMENTS OF CITIZENS OF UKRAINE; AND (III) BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES AND FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR, CHILDREN IN SCHOOLS AND ORPHANAGES IN UKRAINE; AND (B) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO PROVIDE OR PAY FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE UKRAINE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window