Financial history ZION CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1120503
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £14.67k £11.92k £12.31k £9.98k £18.26k
Total expenditure £8.78k £11.11k £11.03k £11.30k £7.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A