ZION CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Zion Christian Ministries meets on a regular basis (weekly and otherwise) in the homes of members and the general public for prayer, bible studies and social gatherings. We have in place a social food basket where those in need are supplied with groceries free of charge. We regularly have religious and social functions such as outings, barbecues, sports games & youth meetings all are welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 August 2007: Standard registration
- 29 January 2013: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 29 January 2013: Funds transferred to 1026935 ACTS MINISTRIES
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.67k | £11.92k | £12.31k | £9.98k | £18.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.78k | £11.11k | £11.03k | £11.30k | £7.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 23 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 23 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 09 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 29 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 29 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 30 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 30 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND WHO ARE AGED OR SICK BY THE PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING, SUPPORT AND ADVICE. 3. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window