Accounts and annual returns THE ROBERT BICKERTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1119678
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 20 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 20 March 2013 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 07 March 2012 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 20 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required