Financial history THE ROBERT BICKERTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1119678
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £7.07k £4.03k £2.81k £3.17k £966
Total expenditure £4.32k £9.42k £4.63k £2.75k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A