MAMA YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAMA Youth Project aims to equip disadvantaged and marginalised young people between the age of 18-30 with the skills & experience that will help them secure long-term and fulfilling employment.We provide training that helps them secure employment,with a particular focus on those wanting to pursue a career in TV or media-an industry particularly closed to those from BAME& disadvantaged backgrounds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£871,691
Donations and legacies | £390.44k | |
Charitable activities | £481.26k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£773,339
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £773.34k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £11,250 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £773.34k | |
Retained for future use | £98.35k |
People

12 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Safira Nazli Afzal | Chair | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tallulah Inger Mary Ferner-Robson | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayobami Akinyode OLUNLOYO | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Mei Leng Yew | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Scott Elliott Pope | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Suzanne Emily Forsyth | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Salvatire Sparace | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MELISSA HOLTON | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £519.37k | £529.41k | £882.64k | £822.47k | £871.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £584.07k | £521.16k | £656.65k | £752.55k | £773.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.79k | N/A | £11.25k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £15.47k | £529.41k | £318.85k | £104.24k | £390.44k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £503.89k | £0 | £563.79k | £718.23k | £481.26k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £529.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £584.07k | £521.16k | £656.65k | £752.55k | £773.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £6.98k | £7.38k | £7.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £70.64k | £0 | £79.38k | £89.81k | £64.92k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £55.20k | £1 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £79.24k | £145.48k | £286.15k | £370.26k | £477.06k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £58.82k | £101.37k | £40.23k | £64.86k | £48.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE FROM DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO BLACK AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITY BACKGROUNDS) AND/OR WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED, HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "DISADVANTAGED YOUTH", BY:- A) PROVIDING TRAINING FOR DISADVANTAGED YOUTH IN THE ART OF AUDIO AND/OR VISUAL MEDIA PRODUCTION (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO TELEVISION PRODUCTION) AND ANCILLARY MATTERS; B) PRODUCING AND STAGING SHOWS, EVENTS AND OTHER PRODUCTIONS WHICH ARE AIMED AT EDUCATING DISADVANTAGED YOUTH IN CONNECTION WITH PRACTICAL ISSUES WHICH ARE OF RELEVANCE TO THEM, AND PRODUCING ANCILLARY MATERIALS; AND C) SPONSORING DISADVANTAGED YOUTH TO HELP THEM GAIN GREATER INVOLVEMENT IN AUDIO AND/OR VISUAL MEDIA PRODUCTION AND SPONSORING EVENTS WHICH THE COMPANY THINKS WILL HELP DISADVANTAGED YOUTH GAIN SUCH GREATER INVOLVEMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Garden Studios
The Hive 42-50 Steele Road
London
NW10 7AS
- Phone:
- 0786921 5301
- Email:
- info@mamayouthproject.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window