ARTREGEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Artregen helps in the regeneration of Pontypool through the Arts. our projects have included an artwork to commemorate the Millenium, a memorial (written and artwork) to a hospital , now being upgraded, relocated and restored an 18th Century arbour, have staged "Opera in the Park" 5times. Provided seats in the Italian gardens around a fountain which we helped to restore. Literary events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Torfaen
Governance
- 20 September 2007: Standard registration
- ARTREGAN (Previous name)
- ARTREGEN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHELAGH CAROLINE HODGES LEWIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Barbara Kay Lawrence | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Carol Mary Simons | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Rose James | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Reeks | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr EDITH PATRICIA PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.25k | £13.61k | £2.86k | £163 | £155 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.10k | £13.53k | £4.79k | £533 | £1.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED 29 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN THE ARTS WITHIN PONTYPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. WORKING WITH LOCAL SCHOOLS; B. PROVIDING PUBLIC EVENTS AND SHOWS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF PONTYPOOL
Area of benefit
PONTYPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 Usk Road
New Inn
Pontypool
NP4 8AF
- Phone:
- 0798915492
- Email:
- reeks910@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window