Financial history BIG BEN TRUST

Charity number: 1119232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £76.70k £95.33k £132.93k £173.39k £197.14k
Total expenditure £80.14k £68.28k £112.22k £122.64k £454.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A