Financial history MILLGATE ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1119394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £76.21k £24.07k £74.56k £108.45k £119.62k
Total expenditure £48.96k £12.02k £66.11k £96.54k £110.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.67k £2.67k N/A N/A