WESTERN SKILLS CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objectives are to provide inclusive curriculum for construction to advance the education of pupils from 14-16 years of age in the Borough of Wigan. We are also offering Construction training for one high school in Kirby and the pupil referral unit in Wigan. These facilities are not required to be provided by the local children and young peoples service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wigan
Governance
- 01 August 2008: Standard registration
- 28 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.69k | £110.70k | £165.42k | £175.15k | £156.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.53k | £173.74k | £172.86k | £171.62k | £179.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 17 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 19 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 29 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 13 December 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT SCHOOLS IN THE WESTERN AREAS OF THE BOROUGH OF WIGAN BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY HE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION IN THE WESTERN AREA OF THE BOROUGH OF WIGAN.
Area of benefit
WIGAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window