THE DAWE FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aiding disadvantaged young people in the UK and on a worldwide basis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNA DAWE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jane Dawe | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PAUL FOX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACOB DAWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.06k | £13.10k | £413.08k | £15.02k | £365.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £268.90k | £340.73k | £284.81k | £339.71k | £500.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED, 23 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
2.2 THE PROMOTION OF ANY PURPOSE THAT IS CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES; IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY AIDING DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE (BEING PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF SIXTEEN AND THIRTY) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD (THE 'OBJECTS') 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE ALL OR PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS 2.4 NOTWITHSTANDING CLAUSE 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, DURING THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE TRUST BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND SHALL HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF IT WERE THE INCOME OF THE TRUST ARISING IN THAT YEAR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLIFTON DOWN HOUSE
54A WHITELADIES ROAD
CLIFTON
BRISTOL
BS8 2NH
- Phone:
- 07710113641
- Email:
- spfoxx@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window