MAIDENHEAD WATERWAYS RESTORATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and undertake the restoration to a navigable standard and on a sustainable basis the historic former waterways that link Maidenhead to the River Thames, for the purpose of enhancing and making accessible the restored waterside environment for the benefit of the general public, wildlife and river users alike.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 10 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD BARKER DAVENPORT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dominic Hurst | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Caird | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Loader | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||
MR JON REEKIE | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.66k | £16.81k | £68.60k | £7.89k | £22.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.27k | £9.10k | £16.08k | £26.74k | £54.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 19 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND UNDERTAKE THE RESTORATION TO A NAVIGABLE STANDARD AND ON A SUSTAINABLE BASIS THE HISTORIC FORMER WATERWAYS THAT LINK MAIDENHEAD TO THE RIVER THAMES, FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENHANCING AND MAKING ACCESSIBLE THE RESTORED WATERSIDE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, WILDLIFE AND RIVER USERS ALIKE.
Area of benefit
MAIDENHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 OLDACRES
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 1XH
- Phone:
- 01628676817
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window