Financial history AL-MADAD TRUST

Charity number: 1120543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.33k £28.39k £36.29k £49.91k £36.51k
Total expenditure £17.95k £20.51k £18.30k £35.79k £26.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A