Financial history SUE LAMBERT TRUST

Charity Number: 1120957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £496.94k £778.82k £1.17m £645.61k £1.07m
Total expenditure £453.44k £494.97k £707.89k £746.15k £1.06m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £241.84k £428.36k £612.66k £491.34k £736.96k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £25.12k £283.92k £19.95k £26.23k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £753.69k £881.07k £620.04k £1.02m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £11 £193 £5.61k £25.34k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £1.79k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £35.21k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £494.97k £707.89k £711.35k £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £34.80k £42.91k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £176.15k £8.52k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £531.74k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0