Financial history THE ANDREW MCCARTNEY TRUST FUND FOR BRAIN TUMOUR RESEARCH

Charity number: 1119876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/04/2020 02/04/2021 02/04/2022 02/04/2023 02/04/2024
Total gross income £2.65k £1.06k £1.43k £1.39k £1.01k
Total expenditure £1.25k £198 £337 £370 £102
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A