Trustees BRITISH EARTHQUAKE AND TSUNAMI SUPPORT
Charity number: 1122133

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Page | Chair | 22 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
Theodore Michael David Lane | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Phillips | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lewis Fair | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Andrew Watt | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Agnes Hooper | Trustee | 22 April 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.