WHITFIELD AND ASPEN STAFF PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1120982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Generation of funds through various mean to provide, assist and support the activities and facilities or items for the education at Whitifeld and Aspen School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JESSICA CLARE ANDREWS Chair 01 July 2024
None on record
Alison May Elizabeth Erskine Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
JASON COOK Trustee 10 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £12.75k £10.47k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.53k £9.43k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 March 2025 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 March 2025 620 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 March 2025 985 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1420 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1420 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Whitfield Aspen School
Mayfield Road
Whitfield
Dover
Kent
CT16 3LJ
Phone:
01304 821526
Website:

No information available