KINGSDOWN & RINGWOULD CEP SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1119780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parent led fundraising to provide additional educational resources to the primary school. Running of recreational fundraising activities for families.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £11,615
Total expenditure: £13,173

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Varley Chair 01 October 2024
None on record
Claire Ashton-Garvey Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Louise Fish Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
Ashley Shaun Parr Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.57k £3.95k £6.82k £9.21k £11.62k
Total expenditure £2.77k £8.29k £6.43k £18.46k £13.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KINGSDOWN & RINGWOULD CEP SCHOOL
GLEN ROAD
KINGSDOWN
DEAL
KENT
CT14 8DD
Phone:
01304 373734