LIVING SANCTUARY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR CHRISTIAN SERVICES TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
- Ghana
- Nigeria
Governance
- 22 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD JANE RUTH HOLDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
HUBERT HUMPHREY HANSON | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CASIUS EWAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89k | £3.58k | £2.18k | £300 | £455 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82k | £1.88k | £889 | £120 | £450 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 259 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 259 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 625 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 625 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
3.1 THE NAME OF THE ORGANISATION IS LIVING SANCTUARY CHURCH. 3.2 THE OBJECT OF THE ORGANISATION IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND BY PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND RECORDED MATERIAL TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 3.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE ORGANISATION IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
116 RALEIGH ROAD
FELTHAM
TW13 4LP
- Phone:
- 02087070528
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window