MENTAL HEALTH NORTH EAST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE AIM TO; PROMOTE JOINT WORKING AND PARTNERSHIP ACROSS THE VOLUNTARY /NOT FOR PROFIT MENTAL HEALTH SECTOR. PROMOTE BEST PRACTICE IN MENTAL HEALTH TO ENSURE HIGH QUALITY PROVISION FOR, AND PARTNERSHIP WITH, SERVICE USERS AND CARERS STRENGTHEN THE ROLE OF MENTAL HEALTH VCS ORGANISATIONS REGIONALLY. SUPPORT LOCALITIES AND MENTAL HEALTH VCS COALITIONS/NETWORKS ACROSS THE REGION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 14 June 2007: Standard registration
- Mental Health North East (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNNE BLAKEY | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALISDAIR STEWART CAMERON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.67k | £9.24k | £29.37k | £8.02k | £10.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.36k | £11.60k | £19.54k | £16.88k | £12.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND BY: PROMOTION OF ANY GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS SUFFERING MENTAL DISTRESS WITHIN LIMITS OF THE NORTH EAST WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, RELIGION, DISABILITY BY WORKING TOGETHER WITH THE MENTAL HEALTH VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY SECTOR AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO BENEFIT THE ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL WELL BEING OF RESIDENTS SUFFERING MENTAL DISTRESS IN AREAS WHERE THE COMPANY OPERATES STRENGTHEN THE ROLE OF THE MENTAL HEALTH VOLUNTARY SECTOR ON A REGIONAL BASIS VIA A CHANNEL OF INFORMATION BETWEEN MENTAL HEALTH VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS LOCAL AND CENTRAL GOVERNMENT AGENCIES, NHS TRUSTS, PCTS OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE REGION PROMOTION OF JOINT WORKING AND PARTNERSHIPS ACROSS THE MENTAL HEALTH VOLUNTARY/NOT FOR PROFIT SECTOR BRINGING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF MENTAL HEALTH VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS, STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND OTHER AGENCIES IN THE REGION TO IDENTIFY THE FUNDING AND POLICY NEEDS OF MENTAL HEALTH VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS PROMOTION OF BEST PRACTICE IN MENTAL HEALTH TO ENSURE HIGH QUALITY PROVISION FOR, AND PARTNERSHIP WITH SERVICE USERS AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
MENTAL HEALTH NORTH EAST
Birtley CDC
Drum Park
DrumLane Industrial Estate
Chester-le-Street
DH2 1AE
- Phone:
- 01914111962
- Email:
- lyn.boyd@mhne.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window