Governing document INDEPENDENT HOUSING UK LTD

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/12/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/03/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/03/2013 as amended on 12 Jan 2021 as amended on 10 May 2021
Charitable objects
The charity's objects ('Objects') are specifically restricted to the following: To relieve the needs of people in vulnerable circumstances including those with learning disabilities, mental health problems and/or physical disabilities by ensuring that they have access to quality social housing which is suitable to their individual need and preference.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.