BRADFORD MOOR OLD SUNDAY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have made grants to the bursary funds of schools to assist with students fees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bradford City
Governance
- 05 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Clifford Kenyon | Trustee | 25 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HEAP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRIS HEAP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR WINSTON MILNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.12k | £1.13k | £1.03k | £1.98k | £708 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £2.00k | £2.00k | £3.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION SEALED 7 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ; 1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT SPECIFIED IN SUB-CLAUSE (1) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT IN FURTHERING THE WORK OF ANY RELIGIOUS ORGANISATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Rosehill Crescent
Low Moor
Bradford
BD12 0UZ
- Phone:
- 01274608763
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window