HOPE IN MOZAMBIQUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
From our base in the UK with local Mozambican representatives working from Matola Ria in Maputo (capital of Mozambique), we are providing new hope and opportunities for young people. We aim to support families and young people to enhance their skills and training to enable them to support themselves and thereby contribute to the future of their nation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Mozambique
Governance
- 16 July 2007: Standard registration
- HIM (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL NUTTALL | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Christine Courage | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY WINSHIP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.32k | £16.50k | £17.43k | £15.46k | £19.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.62k | £16.22k | £17.63k | £14.83k | £20.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 JUNE 2007 as amended on 08 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP WITHIN THE COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING SUITABLE HOUSING AND ACCOMMODATION WHERE NEEDED AND ASSISTING WITH DAILY LIVING EXPENSES AND MEDICAL NEEDS AS REQUIRED. 2.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE TO ENABLE THEM TO SUPPORT THEMSELVES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND BUILD A FUTURE FOR THEMSELVES AND THEIR COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
MOZAMBIQUE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Chantry Farm
Wyke Street
GILLINGHAM
SP8 4FZ
- Phone:
- 01747 835657
- Email:
- jagnuttall@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window