ROBERT HOLMAN MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to small local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 May 2008: Standard registration
- 17 April 2025: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £2.06k | £2.14k | £2.44k | £249 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.00k | £33.75k | £34.00k | £15.06k | £15.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 March 2025 | 395 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, WITH PARTICULAR PREFERENCE FOR SMALL CHARITIES, ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING HOUSING FOR THOSE IN NED AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR HIGHER EDUCATION STUDENTS ON BUSINESS COURSES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS]
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window