Accounts and annual returns PHOENIX FUND FOR ZIMBABWE

Charity number: 1119417
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2014 12 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required