Financial history PHOENIX FUND FOR ZIMBABWE

Charity number: 1119417
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014
Total gross income £2.00k £98.28k £1.25k £0 £0
Total expenditure £14.34k £18.81k £15.54k £1.07k £5.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A