PHOENIX FUND FOR ZIMBABWE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Phoenix Zimbabwe provides financial assistance to Zimbabwean exiles, primarily in the UK, who wish to pursue courses of professional development or vocational training that will equip them to participate in the rebuilding the economy and institutions of Zimbabwe when circumstances allow them to return home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 May 2007: Standard registration
- 12 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- PHONIX FUND FOR ZIMBABWE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £98.28k | £1.25k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.34k | £18.81k | £15.54k | £1.07k | £5.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 12 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST, DATED 7 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
I) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND UNEMPLOYMENT AMONG ZIMBABWEANS WHO HAVE SOUGHT ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ENABLE THEM TO MAKE A CONTRIBUTION TO REBUILDING ZIMBABWE. II) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN ZIMBABWE OR IN TEMPORARY EXILE FROM ZIMBABWE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM FROM ZIMBABWE AND SUCH OTHER GENERAL OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE BY LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window