THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH HINDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In 2020 we did not organize any fundraising activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
83 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 31 May 2007: Standard registration
- FOCH (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF HINDON CHURCH (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Brendan Lewis | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Slade Hall | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Horace William Vine | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Oliver Ellis Bowen | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Evans | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Randolph Gibb | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND MARY GOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KRYSTYNA MARIA GIGIEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.21k | £15.32k | £19.85k | £20.28k | £20.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.37k | £6.40k | £32.86k | £4.05k | £53.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 19 JAN 2007 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
TO RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST HINDON, ITS FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND CHURCHYARD, AND SHALL HAVE NO OTHER PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
HINDON, SALISBURY, WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Salmon Street
Mere
WARMINSTER
Wiltshire
BA12 6FL
- Phone:
- 01747861500
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window