Financial history MANCHESTER JAPANESE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1122679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £85.29k £82.77k £80.90k £108.16k £96.83k
Total expenditure £94.05k £96.42k £91.03k £91.08k £95.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A