BRITISH SOCIETY FOR HISTOCOMPATIBILITY AND IMMUNOGENETICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Annual Conference provides an educational programme of lectures. Training courses are held to support trainee scientists undertake higher qualifications. A CPD scheme helps members to maintain the knowledge and skills required to practice. A bursary scheme helps members to attend scientific and educational meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 April 2008: Standard registration
- BRITISH SOCIETY FOR HISCOMPATIBILITY AND IMMUNGENETICS (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca McGuire | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raymond Fernando | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Maxfield | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olivia Shaw | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corinna Freeman | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Eggleston | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessie Martin | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Ryan | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Smith | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carla Rosser | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Peacock | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helena Lee | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BATTLE | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.66k | £35.93k | £47.06k | £87.58k | £81.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.83k | £71.64k | £74.15k | £76.05k | £72.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 1ST FEBRUARY 2007 (AMENDED) 21ST FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY: A) DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING GOOD PRACTICE IN HISTOCOMPATIBILITY AND IMMUNOGENETICS BY ENSURING THE HIGHEST PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS OF COMPETENCE; B) ENCOURAGING THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH AND KNOWLEDGE AND OF ITS APPLICATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF HISTOCOMPATIBILITY AND IMMUNOGENETICS AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
STOWE HOUSE
ST. CHADS ROAD
LICHFIELD
STAFFS
WS13 6TJ
- Phone:
- 01543442159
- Email:
- accounts@bshi.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window