Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY FOR HISTOCOMPATIBILITY AND IMMUNOGENETICS
Charity number: 1123760

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca McGuire | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raymond Fernando | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Maxfield | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olivia Shaw | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corinna Freeman | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Eggleston | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessie Martin | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Ryan | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Smith | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carla Rosser | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Peacock | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helena Lee | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BATTLE | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.