MULBERRY COMMUNITY PROJECTS (BLACKPOOL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) the relief of persons having an addiction to drugs, alcohol or other noxious substances ; (b) the advancement of public education concerning addictions; (c) such purposes charitable as will benefit the community in the Blackpool area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackpool
Governance
- 16 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON MAGDALENE GORDON | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE JOHNSTON | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BOTTOMLEY | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.03k | £285.78k | £280.14k | £276.39k | £238.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.87k | £246.99k | £242.52k | £261.60k | £278.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.20k | £1.25k | £64.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES, DATED 26 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS HAVING AN ADDICTION TO DRUGS, ALCOHOL OR OTHER NOXIOUS SUBSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE, CARE AND COUNSELLING; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION CONCERNING ADDITIONS AND APPROACHES AND CARE BY THE PUBLICATION TO DISSEMINATE THE RELEVANT INFORMATION; (C) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS WILL BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY IN THE BLACKPOOL AREA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BLACKPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Clifton Street
Blackpool
Lancs
FY1 1JP
- Phone:
- 07840116632
- Email:
- mulberrycompro@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window