KIVETON PARK & WALES VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1122196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the organisation are to provide a village hall for use of the inhabitants of the parish of Wales in the county of South Yorkshire without distinction of political, religious, or other opinions including use for meetings, lectures, classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life of said inhabitants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £60,280
Total expenditure: £89,826

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Rotherham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WALES PARISH FESTIVAL HALL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Margaret Phoenix Trustee 24 February 2020
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Carline Trustee 15 January 2020
None on record
Jessica Jean Reilly Trustee 15 January 2020
None on record
Amanda Louise Armitage-Griffiths Trustee 01 March 2016
None on record
KATHLEEN ANN STANLEY Trustee 08 August 2013
None on record
ROBERT LEE HILL Trustee 15 August 2012
None on record
JOHN HOLDEN Trustee
None on record
JEAN AUDREY DRAKETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £80.07k £61.13k £60.71k £58.55k £60.28k
Total expenditure £85.87k £59.09k £57.59k £58.12k £89.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £35.09k £9.96k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 29 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WALES IN THE COUNTY OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WALES IN THE COUNTY OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Registration history
  • 15 October 2010 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
WALESMOOR AVENUE
KIVETON PARK
SHEFFIELD
S26 5RF
S26 5RF
Phone:
01909770357
Website:

No information available