Accounts and annual returns SOUTH HOLLAND WOMEN'S RESOURCE CENTRE
Charity number: 1120678

Charity reporting is overdue by 1808 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 347 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 347 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 713 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 713 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1078 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1078 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1443 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1443 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1808 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1808 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window