SOUTH HOLLAND WOMEN'S RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The South Holland Women's Resource Centre aims to relieve social isolation in our area. We provide a confidential, supportive & signposting service for women who may be experiencing difficulties in their lives for whatever reason. We are open to all women in the area regardless of background, ethnicity, religious beliefs or sexual orientation. Women do not need to have a problem to join us.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 28 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH BIRCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1074 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1074 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1439 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1439 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1804 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1804 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED 31 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF WOMEN LIVING OR WORKING IN SOUTH HOLLAND, LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MIGRANT WORKERS, ISOLATED WOMEN, WOMEN IN STRESS AND WOMEN WITH LANGUAGE DIFFICULTIES, INCLUDING WOMEN WHOSE FIRST LANGUAGE IS NOT ENGLISH
Area of benefit
SOUTH HOLLAND, LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 STONEGATE
COWBIT
SPALDING
PE12 6AH
- Phone:
- 07738424540
- Email:
- jansosborne@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window