Financial history WEST DEVON COMMUNITY & VOLUNTARY SERVICES

Charity number: 1119730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £175.54k £262.11k £206.55k £517.03k £245.43k
Total expenditure £169.78k £231.36k £191.34k £385.68k £326.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £157.99k £258.56k N/A £205.10k £134.99k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £510.91k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £5.17k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £956 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £385.68k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.26k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £90.41k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A