SHEFFIELD THEATRES CRUCIBLE TRUST

Charity number: 1120640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sheffield Theatres Crucible Trust is a subsidiary of Sheffield Theatres Trust, a complex of 3 theatre spaces. Sheffield Theatres Crucible Theatre Trust specifically accounts for all self produced, tours, transfers and guest productions for the Crucible venues and the building's premises costs, as well as delivering an extensive programme of work in schools and communities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee and another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 August 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dame Julie Ann Kenny Chair 01 July 2024
SHEFFIELD THEATRES TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Anni Margaret Domingo Trustee 13 May 2021
SHEFFIELD THEATRES TRUST
Received: On time
Catherine Ruth Pakenham Trustee 16 March 2021
None on record
Kate Elizabeth Booth Trustee 16 March 2021
None on record
Richard Huntrods Trustee 27 September 2017
None on record
Robert Noble OBE Trustee 24 May 2011
THE ROYAL THEATRICAL FUND
Received: On time
WINDSOR THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time
MATTHEW JAMES BYAM SHAW Trustee
None on record
NEIL ADLEMAN Trustee
CHICHESTER FESTIVAL THEATRE
Received: On time
THE PEGGY RAMSAY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SPLIT INFINITIVE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.25m £2.20m £4.77m £7.16m £5.48m
Total expenditure £4.36m £2.32m £4.60m £6.44m £5.67m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.83m N/A N/A £2.52m £1.64m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.83m £1.86m £2.59m £3.21m £2.07m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.40m £321.88k £1.53m £3.29m £3.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £130.00k £168.75k
Income - Other £20.00k £20.00k £652.16k £523.85k £40.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.36m £2.32m £4.60m £6.44m £5.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.70k £0 £159 £463 £579
Expenditure - Governance £3.60k £3.00k £3.40k £4.60k £53.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £5.37m £5.20m £5.19m £5.56m £5.50m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.85m £1.20m £2.58m £3.66m £1.65m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.65m £949.89k £2.14m £2.90m £1.02m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 04 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 28 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 28 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 15 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 15 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 June 2021 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 June 2021 26 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CRUCIBLE THEATRE
55 NORFOLK STREET
SHEFFIELD
S1 1DA
Phone:
01142496000