AFROLATINO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Afrolatino works with African and Asian refugees and asylum seekers in Leeds to promote confidence and bring about social change. We do this by organising social activities, both educational and creative, to assist community members to integrate into life in Leeds, and reduce isolation. Afrolatino runs regular activities such as music and film production training for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 09 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Mildred Muimo | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Saffie Secka | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacek Golofit | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.21k | £14.20k | £20.00k | £6.80k | £4.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.73k | £14.14k | £19.80k | £6.80k | £4.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £12.00k | £1.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
142 Roundhay Road
LEEDS
LS8 5NA
- Phone:
- 07861492550
- Email:
- neddy@afrolatino.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window