Accounts and annual returns THE ANGELA WEBSTER EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1119313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 26 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 15 March 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 15 March 2024 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 07 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 02 December 2022 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 January 2022 325 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required