THE ANGELA WEBSTER EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to provide support education in Parkside School and to support education for women and girls in countries where such support is restricted by government
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 21 May 2007: Standard registration
- 09 November 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 December 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Marianne Bruggemann | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PAUL WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MARY MARGARET SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ALICIA FENTIMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £100 | £150.00k | £300.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 December 2022 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS WITHIN THE SCHOOLS OF THE CITY OF CAMBRIDGE EDUCATION FOUNDATION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OF EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 WELLINGTON STREET
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 1HW
- Phone:
- 01223507080
- Email:
- andrew@tax.uk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window