Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST ALBANS CHURCH BUILDING TATTENHALL

Charity Number: 1119312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £3.94k £5.61k £5.50k £5.21k £9.19k
Total expenditure £4.70k £769 £2.77k £4.09k £11.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A