Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST ALBANS CHURCH BUILDING TATTENHALL
Charity Number: 1119312

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT EDWARD SELBY | Chair | 21 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Thomson | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanna Margaret Bauldreay | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Martin Ackroyd | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Marylin Forshaw | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Richards | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Chapman | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.