Financial history SHEFFIELD CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1119944
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £29.88k £47.66k £17.61k £23.96k £30.17k
Total expenditure £24.43k £39.87k £26.99k £27.18k £37.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A