Accounts and annual returns HOLY GHOST POWER CHAPEL

Charity number: 1121452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 January 2021 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 December 2020 61 days late Download Open in new window