THE ELDERS COUNCIL OF NEWCASTLE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Representing the views, concerns and ideas of older people in Newcastle upon Tyne
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £59,620 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 23 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Raffle | Chair | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nadeem Syed Ahmad | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Margaret Scott | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Bruce Telfer | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Bruce Davenport | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Williamson | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Chalmers Gowers | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
VIOLET ROOK | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.18k | £74.12k | £76.34k | £88.87k | £88.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.91k | £46.73k | £86.66k | £98.30k | £113.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £51.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £44.00k | £44.00k | £6.00k | £60.75k | £59.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED 26 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS ASSOCIATED WITH AGEING OF OLDER PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS; B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH; C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE.
Area of benefit
TYNE AND WEAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
2nd Floor
Biomedical Research Building
Campus for Ageing and Vitality
Nuns Moor road
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE4 5PL
- Phone:
- 01912082701
- Email:
- info@elderscouncil.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window