BROWNHILLS AND WALSALL WOOD FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Services to Walsall Wood&Brownhills OAPs, disabled, learning difficulties. Fully accessible- large hall, meeting room, kitchen, hosting receptions, parties, funeral gatherings. Hosts social evenings, Darby&Joan, Lunch Club, Craft/sewing Group. Midland Mencap use facilities weekly for social groups. Charity is fostering links with partner organizations Police, Churches, Veterans and Food banks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Walsall
Governance
- 04 April 2008: Standard registration
- BROWNHILLS AND DISTRICT FELLOWSHIP FOR THE HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN PAUL | Chair |
|
||||||
Joseph Harrison | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Hampton Cornforth | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lara Hosier | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Rose Hall | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mr Ben Turner | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Angela Deakin | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.72k | £23.17k | £30.11k | £26.79k | £27.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.27k | £32.73k | £21.31k | £22.94k | £46.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED BE SPECIAL DECLARATION DATED 6 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS ARE TO BE WITHIN THE DISTRICT OF BROWNHILLS AND WALSALL WOOD AND THEIR RESPECTIVE AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND ARE AS FOLLOWS:- 3.1 THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 3.1.1 TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PHYSICALLY AND MENTAL DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO ASSIST THEM IN MEETING THEIR OWN NEEDS IN THE COMMUNITY BY: 3.1.1.1 INCREASING THEIR INVOLVEMENT WITHIN THE COMMUNITY 3.1.1.2 ADVOCATING ON BEHALF OF THE BENEFICIARIES 3.1.1.3 RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF THE BENEFICIARIES WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS AND OTHERS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO ENSURE BETTER SERVICE AND SUPPORT FOR THE COMMUNITY IN THE SERVICES AND FACILITIES WHICH ARE OFFERED.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE DISTRICT OF BROWNHILLS AND WALSALL WOOD AND THEIR RESPECTIVE AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brownhills&Walsall Wood Fellowship
Community Centre
Beacon Way
WALSALL
WS9 9HZ
- Phone:
- 01543375601
- Email:
- bbwf@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window